+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/30/2015
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/23/15
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
March 23, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor