+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2-18-19
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
February 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor