+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- Adopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/10/2021
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2009: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2009: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor