+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/4/2021
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/25/2021
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
February 25, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor