+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/8/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- All added as Sponsors
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/1/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2013
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/26/2013
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to State Government Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Delayed Bills Comm.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 3/13/2013
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
April 8, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
April 1, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
March 28, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 26, 2013: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (83)
Type:
Primary Sponsor