+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/4/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0
- All added as Sponsors
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/30/13
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
January 30, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
+ − Sponsors (93)
Type:
Primary Sponsor