+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Signed by Governor.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Placed on consent cal. 1 for Monday, 3-4-13
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 87, Nays 0
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/25/13
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
February 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
+ − Sponsors (80)
Type:
Primary Sponsor