+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 4 calendar for 4/25/2018
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
April 25, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 27
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor