+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/25/2018
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. #2
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 29
April 24, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor