+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 2
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/19/18
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 33
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor