+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/27/2022
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/25/22
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
April 25, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor