+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/8/2016
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health & Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/3/2016
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2
- All Ayes added as Sponsors
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/30/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/18/2015
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c to Health Subcommittee
- Ref. to Health Committee
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (10)
February 8, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
February 3, 2016: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Health and Welfare Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 30, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 30, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 3
March 30, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 30, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Consent Calendar for
March 18, 2015: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 18, 2015: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 10, 2015: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
March 10, 2015: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (86)
Type:
Primary Sponsor