+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 6/8/2020
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 6/3/20
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
June 3, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor