+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 83, Nays 2, PNV 4
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018
- Reset on cal. for 4/18/2018
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2018
- Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
April 24, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur
- Yeas: 33
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 2
April 16, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 16, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 11, 2018: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 11, 2018: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor