+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 83, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4-4-18
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 33
April 4, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 83
+ − Sponsors (2)
Love
Type:
Primary Sponsor