+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/25/2013
- Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0
- All added as Sponsors
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/14/13
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
February 14, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
+ − Sponsors (89)
Type:
Primary Sponsor