+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/7/2022
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/31/22
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
March 31, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor