+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/4/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- Ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.