+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended, Concurred, voice vote
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted., vv.
- All Ayes added as Sponsors
- Motion to reconsider adopted.
- Motion to lift from table adopted.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 3
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-19-18
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
+ − Sponsors (72)
Type:
Primary Sponsor