+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On November 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- Signed by H. Speaker
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 10/29/2021
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On October 29, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 2
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On October 28, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 10/29/21
+ − Vote
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor