+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/2/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/27/2018
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 73, Nays 14, PNV 1
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/5/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
- Move to Heel
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to State Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 10
March 27, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 10
March 5, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 5, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 27, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 27, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 21, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
February 21, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (38)
VanHuss
Type:
Primary Sponsor