+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/30/2019
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- R/S Intro., adopted v.v.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Held on desk.
- Objected to on Consent Calendar.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/23/19
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor