+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Constitutional Amendment Calendar
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/8/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
- Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2016: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 1, 2016: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2