+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- H. subst. & concurred in SJR 33
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/13/2017
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/9/2017
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 2/7/2017
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 13, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 7, 2017: EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 7, 2017: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION & PLANNING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor