+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/25/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 5
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-18-19
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor