+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015
- Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- All Ayes added as Sponsors
- Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
- Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 4/9/15
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
April 9, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor