+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- All Ayes added as Sponsors
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Adopted as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0849)
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018
- Reset on cal. for 4/23/2018
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0849)
- Reset on cal. for 4/19/2018
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/17/2018
- Move to Heel
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2018
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Intro., ref. to State Government Committee
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Delayed Bill Committee
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 5/1/2017
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
- Sponsor change.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
April 23, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 95
April 17, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 17, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
April 17, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 16, 2018: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 16, 2018: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 13, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 13, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 7, 2018: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
March 7, 2018: STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (81)
Towns
Type:
Primary Sponsor