+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/10/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/3/2016
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 1/20/2016
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2016
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor