+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 341
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Move to Heel
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/4/2017
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.