+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor