+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Held on desk.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2013
- Reset on Reg. cal. for 4/4/13
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/19/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/13/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0154
Amendment 1-0 to HB0985