+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 359
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0296)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/10/2013
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/2/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0296
Amendment 1-0 to HB0982
+ − Votes (6)
April 17, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 29
April 16, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95