+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 219
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/4/2017
- Rec. for pass if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/14/2017
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 13, 2017: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 13, 2017: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 4, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 4, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 29, 2017: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 29, 2017: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 14, 2017: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 14, 2017: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 7, 2017: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
March 7, 2017: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor