+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/5/2017
- Move to Heel
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor