+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
- Sponsor change.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor