+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2019: HOUSE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
March 13, 2019: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor