+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
- Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/26/2017
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/19/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/22/2017
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/22/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/15/2017
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/15/2017
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/8/2017
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 22, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 22, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 28, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
February 28, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor