+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/18/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to last calendar of 2014
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/27/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.