+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 1030
- Effective date(s) 05/21/2018
On May 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 84, Nays 2, PNV 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/19/2017
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/28/2017
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (12)
April 24, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 24, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 2