+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 108
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
- No Action Taken
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction