+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/16/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 8, 2016: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor