+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
- Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor