+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/10/2020
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/18/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor