+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Filed for intro.