+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 662
- Effective date(s) 04/14/20014
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 23, Nays 6, PNV 1
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- S. Am. 8 tabled
- Motion to reconsider adopted.
- Tabling motion lifted
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 3/27/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 8
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/17/2014
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 23, Nays 6, PNV 1
- S. adopted am. 8
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Am. no. 4 tabled Ayes 69, Nays 24
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0598)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0656)
- Am. no. 5 tabled Ayes 65, Nays 25
- Am. no. 3 tabled Ayes 69, Nays 24
- Am. no. 6 tabled Ayes 69, Nays 24
- Am. no. 7 tabled Ayes 68, Nays 25
- Am. no. 8 tabled Ayes 67, Nays 25
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 24
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/24/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/18/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/12/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/4/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 1/29/2014
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 2014
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/27/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/27/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/27/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (18)
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: DAY CERTAIN
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 21
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE AMEND# 8 BY Kyle
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: LIFT FROM THE TABLE MOTION TO RECONSIDER
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 8
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 32
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 8
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 23
March 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 7 BY Finney L
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 21
March 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 8 BY Kyle
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
March 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 3 BY Kyle
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
March 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 9 BY Overbey
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 18
March 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 25
February 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 25
February 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 24
February 18, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
February 12, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
February 4, 2014: INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE
January 29, 2014: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor