+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 179
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction