+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 285
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2013
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 26, Nays 2
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/11/2013
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/11/2013
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2013
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/13/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
March 21, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 14, 2013: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 13, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 5, 2013: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor