+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/25/2014
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/4/2014
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/4/2014
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 1/21/2014
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to Department of ED
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 25, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor