+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 05/04/2021; 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 335
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0223)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0202)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021
- Action def. in Education Administration to 3/31/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/24/2021
- Action def. in Education Administration to 3/24/2021
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/17/2021
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/9/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
- Sponsor change.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 19, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
April 12, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
March 31, 2021: HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 9, 2021: K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor