+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 23
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2015
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/11/2015
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/4/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
- Ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
- P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.